EP0128474 - Orthodontic appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klepacki, Frank H. 1501 Burr Ridge Club Drive 6240S. County Line Road Burr Ridge Illinois 60521 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states Klepacki, Frank H. 1501 Burr Ridge Club Drive 6240S. County Line Road Burr Ridge Illinois 60521 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 84106248.2 | 01.06.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | US19830501505 | 06.06.1983 Original published format: US 501505 | [1984/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128474 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128474 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/00 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
A61C7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/51] | Title | German: | Orthodontische Vorrichtung | [1984/51] | English: | Orthodontic appliance | [1984/51] | French: | Dispositif orthodontique | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 11.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.02.1988 | GB | 01.06.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/32] | GB | 01.06.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2125587 (ANNIE RICHARDSON); | [Y]GB1079008 (THOMAS JOSEPH PROVENZA); | [A]DE2022730 (ORTHO INTERNAT SERVICES INC); | [YD]US3922787 (FISCHER KENNETH J, et al); | [A]US3936939 (FAUNCE FRANK R); | [A]DE2741550 (SCHEU DENTAL); | [AD]US4216583 (REYNOLDS JAMES M [US]); | [A]US4299569 (FRANTZ LEONARD) |