blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0131136

EP0131136 - Countersink [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.1988
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.08.1988 [1988/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heule, Heinrich
Kristallstrasse 6
CH-9434 Au / CH
[1985/03]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1985/03]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt
Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/50]Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwalt
Postfach 31 60
D-88113 Lindau / DE
Former [1985/04]Riebling, Günter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. P. Riebling, Postfach 31 60
D-88113 Lindau / DE
Former [1985/03]Riebling, Günter Dr.-Ing., Dipl.-Ing., Ing.grad.
Rennerle 10 Postfach 3160
D-8990 Lindau / DE
Application number, filing date84106280.501.06.1984
[1985/03]
Priority number, dateDE1983332111010.06.1983         Original published format: DE 3321110
[1985/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0131136
Date:16.01.1985
Language:DE
[1985/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0131136
Date:09.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.1984
ClassificationIPC:B23B51/10
[1985/03]
CPC:
B23B51/10 (EP,US); Y10T408/26 (EP,US); Y10T408/5587 (EP,US);
Y10T408/909 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/03]
TitleGerman:Kegelsenker[1985/03]
English:Countersink[1985/03]
French:Aléseur à tête conique[1985/03]
Examination procedure07.05.1985Examination requested  [1985/30]
05.03.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.03.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.1987Fee for grant paid
19.05.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.06.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE7441332U  ;
 [X]US1377495  (LOGAN MARSELIUS J);
 [A]US2187221  (BROWN FRANK G);
 [A]GB1324960  (GIBSON BROS HEBDEN BRIDGE LTD);
 [A]CH597960  (EVARD JEAN PIERRE);
 [X]US4293254  (MARKOVICS MICHAEL)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.