EP0129177 - Nematic benzonitriles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1987 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petrzilka, Martin, Dr. Schwarzackerstrasse 54 CH-4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | 02 /
Villiger, Alois, Dr. Im Ettingerhof 5 CH-4055 Basel / CH | [1984/52] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Hans, et al c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | Zimmermann, Hans, Dr., et al c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160 CH-4003 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 84106629.3 | 09.06.1984 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | CH19830003334 | 17.06.1983 Original published format: CH 333483 | [1984/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129177 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129177 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C121/60, C07C121/75, C07C120/00, C09K3/34, G02F1/13 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07C31/1355 (EP,US);
C07C45/44 (EP,US);
C07C45/513 (EP,US);
C07C47/11 (EP,US);
C07C63/49 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/44, C07C47/34 (EP,US);
C07C45/513, C07C47/11 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/52] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristalline Benzonitrile | [1984/52] | English: | Nematic benzonitriles | [1984/52] | French: | Bentonitriles nématiques | [1984/52] | File destroyed: | 14.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 03.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/20] | 12.12.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4035056 (COATES DAVID, et al); | [A]AT354534B (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2023136 (SECR DEFENCE); | [A]CH636371 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]); | [AP]US4400293 (ROEMER MICHAEL [DE], et al) |