EP0128579 - Pump for selectively feeding the front windscreen washer and rear window washer of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1989 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1989 [1989/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berta, Secondo Via Valgrana, 2 I-10090 Reano (Torino) / IT | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Prato, Roberto, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | Prato, Roberto, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 84106693.9 | 12.06.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | IT19830053466U | 15.06.1983 Original published format: IT 5346683 U | [1984/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128579 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128579 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/50 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
F04D29/506 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1984/51] | Title | German: | Pumpe für die wahlweise Versorgung der vorderen Windschutzscheiben-Waschanlage und der hinteren Windschutzscheiben-Waschanlage eines Fahrzeugs | [1984/51] | English: | Pump for selectively feeding the front windscreen washer and rear window washer of a vehicle | [1984/51] | French: | Pompe pour l'alimentation sélective du lave-glace avant et du lave-glace arrière d'un véhicule | [1984/51] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 29.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2278542 ; | [X]DE2334390 ; | [Y]FR1142593 ; | [Y]DE2360601 ; | [A]GB945956 ; | [A]GB507487 ; | [A]GB1120505 ; | [A]US2480108 ; | [A]FR1241403 |