EP0129771 - Process for the preparation of E-isomers of 1-cyclohexyl-2-(1,2,4-triazol-1-yl)-1-penten-3-ones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1989 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1989 [1989/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feyen, Peter, Dr. Mozartstrasse 1 D-4020 Mettmann / DE | 02 /
Rauleder, Gebhard, Dr. Mozartstrasse 20 D-5657 Haan 1 / DE | 03 /
Reiser, Wolf, Dr. Kiebitzweg 12a D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1985/01] | Application number, filing date | 84106709.3 | 13.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | DE19833322818 | 24.06.1983 Original published format: DE 3322818 | [1985/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129771 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129771 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129771 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von E-Isomeren von 1-Cyclo-hexyl-2-(1,2,4-triazol-1-yl)-1-penten-3-on-Derivaten | [1985/01] | English: | Process for the preparation of E-isomers of 1-cyclohexyl-2-(1,2,4-triazol-1-yl)-1-penten-3-ones | [1985/01] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'isomères E de 1-cyclohexyl-2-(1,2,4-triazol-1-yl)-1-pentène-3-ones | [1985/01] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 17.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0015387 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0057357 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0101996 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]US4486218 (REISER WOLF [DE], et al) |