EP0141017 - Rotor, in particular for a rotorcraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung D-81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frommlet, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing. Ahornring 65 D-8011 Höhenkirchen / DE | [1985/20] | Application number, filing date | 84106719.2 | 13.06.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | DE19833332417 | 08.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3332417 | [1985/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141017 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141017 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/33 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
B64C27/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/20] | Title | German: | Rotor, insbesondere eines Drehflügelflugzeugs | [1985/20] | English: | Rotor, in particular for a rotorcraft | [1985/20] | French: | Rotor, en particulier pour un aéronef à voilure tournante | [1985/20] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 20.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3701612 (BREUNER GERALD L); | [Y]US2845131 (THEODOR LAUFER); | [A]DE1169306 (DORNIER WERKE GMBH) |