Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3465945D1 | 15.10.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3465945 | 13.06.1984 | DE3332417 | 08.09.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0141017 | Global Dossier | 09.09.1987 | B1 | EP0141017 | 15.05.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3332417 | 08.09.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3332417 | 03.04.1986 | C2 | DE3332417 | 28.03.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3332417 | 08.09.1983 |