EP0129815 - Thermoplastic moulding masses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitulla, Konrad, Dr. An der Froschlache 23 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Swoboda, Johann, Dr. Neuwiesenstrasse 28 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Echte, Adolf, Dr. Leuschnerstrasse 42 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Ruppmich, Karl Koenigsbacher Strasse 134 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
Siebel, Peter, Dr. Trifelsring 20 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [1985/01] | Application number, filing date | 84106933.9 | 16.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | DE19833322747 | 24.06.1983 Original published format: DE 3322747 | [1985/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129815 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129815 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129815 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/12, C08L25/16, C08L51/04 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
C08L25/12 (EP);
C08L25/16 (EP);
C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L55/02 (EP);
C08L9/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L25/16, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/01] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Formmasse | [1985/01] | English: | Thermoplastic moulding masses | [1985/01] | French: | Masses de moulage thermoplastiques | [1985/01] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 24.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4169869 (MILENIUS DAVID L [US]); | [XD]US3449470 (GRABOWSKI THOMAS S) |