EP0131177 - Container for storing radioactive materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1989 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1989 [1989/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Gesellschaft für Wiederaufarbeitung von Kernbrennstoffen mbH Postfach 14 07 30014 Hannover / DE | For all designated states Nukem GmbH Rodenbacher Chaussee 6 Postfach 11 00 80 D-63434 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | For all designated states Deutsche Gesellschaft für Wiederaufarbeitung von Kernbrennstoffen mbH Postfach 14 07 D-30014 Hannover / DE | ||
For all designated states Nukem GmbH Rodenbacher Chaussee 6 Postfach 11 00 80 D-63434 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Popp, Franz-Wolfgang, Dr. Kuhstrasse 5 D-3002 Wedemark / DE | 02 /
Velten, Reinhold Peter-Weil-Strasse 2 D-6336 Solms / DE | [1985/03] | Application number, filing date | 84106955.2 | 18.06.1984 | [1985/03] | Priority number, date | DE19833325119 | 12.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3325119 | [1985/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131177 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131177 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G21F5/00 | [1985/03] | CPC: |
G21F5/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1985/03] | Title | German: | Behälter zum Lagern von radioaktiven Stoffen | [1985/03] | English: | Container for storing radioactive materials | [1985/03] | French: | Récipient de stockage d'effluents radioactifs | [1985/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 01.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/09] | Request for further processing for: | 18.02.1987 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.1987 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.1987 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0057134 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]GB1583188 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]FR2412241 (WIEDERAUFARBEITUNG VON KERNBRE [DE]); | [A]FR1500850 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) |