EP0134921 - Copolymer, process for its preparation and its use as a sorbent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELLA Aktiengesellschaft Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | [1985/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keil, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Lübecker Weg 3 D-6450 Hanau-Mittelbuchen / DE | 02 /
Engelhardt, Fritz, Dr. Hünfelder Strasse 20 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 61 / DE | 03 /
Greiner, Ulrich, Dr. Nidderauer Strasse 13 D-6369 Schöneck 1 / DE | 04 /
Kühlein, Klaus, Dr. Fasanenstrasse 41 D-6233 Kelkheim/Ts / DE | 05 /
Keller, Reinhold, Dr. Wiesenweg 5 D-6232 Bad Soden/Ts / DE | 06 /
Schlingmann, Merten, Dr. Schneidhainer Strasse 32a D-6240 Königstein / DE | 07 /
Hess, Gerhard Düdelsheimer Strasse 7 D-6472 Altenstadt/2 / DE | [1985/13] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg, et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr., et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 84106958.6 | 18.06.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | DE19833324835 | 09.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3324835 | [1985/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0134921 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134921 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F226/00, C08F226/06, C22B3/00, // (C08F226/00, 226:06, 230:08, 230:06),(C08F226/06, 226:00, 230:08, 230:06) | [1985/13] | CPC: |
C08F226/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/13] | Title | German: | Copolymerisat, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung als Sorptionsmittel | [1985/13] | English: | Copolymer, process for its preparation and its use as a sorbent | [1985/13] | French: | Copolymère, procédé de sa préparation et son usage comme agent de sorption | [1985/13] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 04.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.05.1987 | IT | 20.05.1987 | NL | 20.05.1987 | SE | 31.05.1987 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/18] | BE | 20.05.1987 | |
NL | 20.05.1987 | ||
SE | 31.05.1987 | ||
Former [1988/52] | BE | 20.05.1987 | |
NL | 20.05.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 20.05.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3817745 (COPES J, et al); | [AD]DE3043766 (KOEI CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |