EP0132584 - Method and installation for reducing the emission of noxious matter in the flue gases of combustion plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferdinand Lentjes Dampfkessel- und Maschinenbau Hansa-Allee 304 D-4000 Düsseldorf/Oberkassel / DE | [1985/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraus, Willibald, Dipl.-Ing. verstorben / DE | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | König, Reimar, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | König, Reimar, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Reimar König Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Bergen Wilhelm-Tell-Strasse 14 Postfach 260254 D-40095 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107036.0 | 19.06.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | DE19833326100 | 20.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3326100 | DE19833329337 | 13.08.1983 Original published format: DE 3329337 | DE19833331545 | 01.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3331545 | [1985/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132584 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132584 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132584 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F23C6/04, F23J15/00, F23L15/04, B01D53/36, F22B31/04, F23N5/00 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
B01D53/86 (EP,US);
F22B31/04 (EP,US);
F23C6/042 (EP,US);
F23J15/006 (EP,US);
F23L15/04 (EP,US);
F23N5/00 (EP,US);
F23C2201/301 (EP,US);
F23J2215/20 (EP,US);
F23J2215/40 (EP,US);
F23J2217/102 (EP,US);
F23J2219/10 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1985/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zum Vermindern der Schadstoffemissionen in Rauchgasen von Feuerungsanlagen | [1985/07] | English: | Method and installation for reducing the emission of noxious matter in the flue gases of combustion plants | [1985/07] | French: | Procédé et installation pour diminuer l'émission de la matière nocive dans les gaz d'échappement des installations de combustion | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 27.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2658208 (PARSONS CO RALPH M); | [Y]DE1088176 (OXY CATALYST INC); | [A]GB2037607 (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD); | [A]DE2919812 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]US4128506 (HEGEDUS LOUIS, et al); | [AP]US4444128 (MONRO RICHARD J [US]); | [A]US3463599 (WELTY ALBERT B JR); | [A]DE3215073 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3110361 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]); | [A]GB1544169 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO); | [A]GB232091 (WILLIAM MILLS CONNERY); | [A]DE2951104 (BALCKE DUERR AG); | [AP]DE3240553 (BOJAK KURT); | [AP]US4395223 (OKIGAMI NOBORU [JP], et al) | [Y] - IRON AND STEEL ENGINEER, Band 41, Nr. 5, Mai 1964, Seite 167, Pittsburgh, US; "System eliminates solids and sulphur fumes from stack discharge" |