EP0129836 - Circuit for the retrieval of the data contained in binary signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Herbert Johann-Hackl-Ring 34 D-8011 Neukeferloh / DE | [1985/01] | Application number, filing date | 84107057.6 | 19.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | DE19833322623 | 23.06.1983 Original published format: DE 3322623 | [1985/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129836 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129836 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129836 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/00, G11B5/09 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
G11B20/10222 (EP,US);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/1419 (EP,US);
G11B20/1423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Wiedergewinnen von in binären Datensignalen enthaltenen Daten | [1985/01] | English: | Circuit for the retrieval of the data contained in binary signals | [1985/01] | French: | Circuit pour retrouver l'information contenue dans des signaux binaires | [1985/01] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 25.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.10.1989 | NL | 11.10.1989 | SE | 11.10.1989 | AT | 19.06.1990 | CH | 30.06.1990 | LI | 30.06.1990 | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/03] | NL | 11.10.1989 | |
SE | 11.10.1989 | ||
AT | 19.06.1990 | ||
CH | 30.06.1990 | ||
LI | 30.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | NL | 11.10.1989 | |
SE | 11.10.1989 | ||
CH | 30.06.1990 | ||
LI | 30.06.1990 | ||
Former [1990/27] | NL | 11.10.1989 | |
SE | 11.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/21] | SE | 11.10.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3506923 (AMBRICO LOUIS E, et al); | [AD]DE2221134 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US3893170 (KELLNER JOSEF, et al); | [A]DE2638513 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2849368 (CII HONEYWELL BULL); | [A]US4246545 (REISFELD FREDERICK) | [A] - ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, Band 55, Nr. 7, April 1983, Seiten 155-157, New York, US; G. DI BIANCA: "Ingenious data encoding fills floppy disks twice as full" |