EP0129254 - Process for the preparation of N-tau-substituted histidine derivatives, the N-tau-substituted histidine derivatives and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diamalt Aktiengesellschaft Georg-Reismüller-Strasse 34 D-8000 München 50 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states DIAMALT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Georg-Reismüller-Strasse 34 D-8000 München 50 / DE | ||
Former [1984/52] | For all designated states Diamalt Aktiengesellschaft Friedrichstrasse 18 D-8000 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voelter, Wolfgang, Prof. Dr. Panoramastrasse 71 D-7400 Tübingen-Hageloch / DE | [1984/52] | Application number, filing date | 84107071.7 | 20.06.1984 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1985/34] |
Former [1984/52] | deleted | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129254 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129254 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/64, C07K5/08, A61K37/02 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07K5/06173 (EP,US);
C07K5/0825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-tau-substituierten Histidinderivaten, N-tau-substituierte Histidinderivate und ihre Verwendung | [1984/52] | English: | Process for the preparation of N-tau-substituted histidine derivatives, the N-tau-substituted histidine derivatives and their use | [1984/52] | French: | Procédé de préparation de N-tau-dérivés d'histidine substitués, les N-tau-dérivés d'histidine substitués et leur emploi | [1984/52] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 20.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 21.01.1985 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 07.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 13.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/14] | 30.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/14] | Request for further processing for: | 19.05.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1990 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1341375 (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB) | [X] - RECUEIL, JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL NETHERLANDS CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 97, Nr. 11, November 1978, Seiten 293-295, Den Haag, NL; A. NOORDAM et al.: "A convenient synthesis of L-N-tau-methylhistidine and L-N-tau-ethylhistidine (imidazole chemistry, part IV)" | [Y] - J. HETER. CHEMISTRY, Band 2, März 1965, Seiten 41-43; W.B. WRIGHT, Jr.: "N,N'-carbonyldiimidazole as a reagent for the preparation of five-membered heterocycles" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 92, Nr. 21, 26. Mai 1980, Seite 699, Zusammenfassung Nr. 181601q, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.I. KNIGHT et al.: "The preparation of N-tau-[3H]methylhistamine dihydrochloride and N-tau- methyl[alpha,beta,2,4,5-14C5]histamine dihydrochloride", & J. LABELLED COMPD. RADIOPHARM. 1979, 16(5), 761-9 | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Band 25, Nr. 9, September 1982, Seiten 1168-1174, American Chemical Society, US; J.C. EMMETT et al.: "Potential histamine H2-receptor antagonists. 4. Benzylhistamines" | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Band 19, Nr. 7, Juli 1976, Seiten 923-928, American Chemical Society, US; G.J. DURANT et al.: "Potential histamine H2-receptor antagonists. 3. Methylhistamines" |