EP0129883 - Frontal system for plug-in component boards insertable into frames, and frame for receiving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Willi PLanstrasse 20 D-7527 Kraichtal / DE | 02 /
Kessler, Otto Am Rathausplatz 5 D-6729 Wörth / DE | 03 /
Klein, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Im Kirchbühl 3 D-7512 Rheinstetten 1 / DE | 04 /
Schmitt, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. August-Croissant Strasse 2 D-6740 Landau / DE | 05 /
Wojtas, Gerhard Germersheimer Strasse 6 D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE | [1985/01] | Application number, filing date | 84107202.8 | 22.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | DE19833322856 | 24.06.1983 Original published format: DE 3322856 | DE19843408073 | 05.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3408073 | [1985/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129883 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129883 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129883 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, H05K7/18 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
H05K7/1409 (EP);
H05K9/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | Frontsystem für in Baugruppenträger einschiebbare Steckbaugruppen und rahmenartige Baugruppenträger zu deren Aufnahme | [1985/01] | English: | Frontal system for plug-in component boards insertable into frames, and frame for receiving the same | [1985/01] | French: | Système frontal pour des plaquettes de composants insérables dans un bâti et un bâti pour recevoir celles-ci | [1985/01] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 10.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.03.1989 | [1989/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2225916 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]); | [Y]DE3119249 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]US4243283 (MCSPARRAN JOSEPH F) |