Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] |
19.07.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.09.1989 [1989/36] |
04.02.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] |
06.05.1988 | First examination report | |
23.01.1986 | Publication of search report | published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] |
07.01.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.1985 [1985/11] |
02.11.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.01.1985 [1985/01] |