EP0131190 - Test apparatus for digital speech interpolator for use in TDMA scheme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shigaki, Seiichiro c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107268.9 | 25.06.1984 | [1985/03] | Priority number, date | JP19830113626 | 25.06.1983 Original published format: JP 11362683 | [1985/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0131190 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0131190 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131190 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/17, H04J3/14 | [1985/03] | CPC: |
H04J3/172 (EP,US);
H04J3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1985/03] | Title | German: | Prüfungsgerät für digitalen Sprachinterpolator zur Anwendung in einem Vielfachzugriffszeitmultiplexsystem | [1985/03] | English: | Test apparatus for digital speech interpolator for use in TDMA scheme | [1985/03] | French: | Appareil de test pour interpolateur numérique de parole pour usage dans un système AMRT | [1985/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.06.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 29.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP55068755 ; | [A]JP58019049 ; | [Y]US3770894 (MAY C) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 112 (E-21)[594], 12th August 1980; & JP-A-55 068 755 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 23-05-1980, & JP55068755 A 00000000 | [A] - DEUXIEME COLLOQUE INTERNATIONAL SUR LES TELECOMMUNICATIONS NUMERIQUES PAR SATELLITE, 28th - 30th November 1972, Paris, FR, pages 306-313; U. REINER et al.: "D9 - Reflections and proposals concerning the solution of TDMA-typical measuring and supervision problems" | [A] - COMSAT TECHNICAL REVIEW, vol. 6, no. 1, Spring 1976, pages 127-158, Washington, US; S.J. CAMPANELLA: "Digital speech interpolation" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 94 (E-171)[1239], 20th April 1983; & JP-A-58 019 049 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 03-02-1983, & JP58019049 A 00000000 | [AP] - PROCEEDINGS IEEE SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS, 19th - 23rd September 1983, Phoenix, Arizona, US, pages II-14 - II-23; R. RIDINGS et al.: "Verification tests of a prototype intelsat TDMA/DSI terminal" |