EP0139842 - Socket terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1987 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PREH, Elektrofeinmechanische Werke Jakob Preh Nachf. GmbH & Co. Postfach 17 40 97607 Bad Neustadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states PREH, Elektrofeinmechanische Werke Jakob Preh Nachf. GmbH & Co. Postfach 17 40 D-97607 Bad Neustadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reuss, Oswald Neuer Weg 26 D-8741 Unterelsbach / DE | [1985/19] | Application number, filing date | 84107322.4 | 26.06.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | DE19833327414 | 29.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3327414 | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0139842 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0139842 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/70, H01R13/115 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
H01R27/02 (EP,US);
H01R11/07 (KR);
H01R12/727 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Buchsenleiste | [1985/19] | English: | Socket terminal | [1985/19] | French: | Réglette de douilles | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 12.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2203513 (DAUT & RIETZ KG); | [AD]DE2104406 ; | [AD]DE2452402 (DAUT & RIETZ KG); | [A]FR2309056 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]FR2311426 (DU PONT NEDERLAND [NL]); | [AD]DE2851712 (BACH & CO) |