EP0142605 - Box beam bicycle type frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXCELSIOR FITNESS EQUIPMENT CO. 613 Academy Drive Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states EXCELSIOR FITNESS EQUIPMENT CO. 613 Academy Drive Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szymski, Eugene J. 9453 North Lawler Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | 02 /
Mraz, Rene 2143 Forestview Road Evanston Illinois 60201 / US | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107364.6 | 26.06.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | US19830549798 | 09.11.1983 Original published format: US 549798 | [1985/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142605 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142605 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/16 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
A63B22/0605 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1985/22] | Title | German: | Kastenrahmen für ein Zimmerfahrrad | [1985/22] | English: | Box beam bicycle type frame | [1985/22] | French: | Châssis type boîte pour un cyclo-exerciseur | [1985/22] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 12.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 14.07.1988 | Appeal received | 14.07.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.08.1988 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1281731 [ ]; | DD9127 [ ]; | US518411 [ ] | Examination | US3664027 | - Bautechnische Zahlentafeln, Seiten 373, 374 |