Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1225109 | 04.08.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | CA428404 | 18.05.1983 | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | CA502818 | 26.02.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3368029D1 | 15.01.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | EP83303584 | 22.06.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4596545 | 24.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | US69916085 | 07.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0100143 | Global Dossier | 12.06.1985 | B1 | EP0100143 | 08.02.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0132617 | Global Dossier | 03.12.1986 | B1 | EP0132617 | 13.02.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1204798 | 20.05.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE100143T | 17.01.1985 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3360261D1 | 18.07.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0777771B | 23.08.1995 | B2 | JPS5926833 | 13.02.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4518301 | 21.05.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US39528882 | 06.07.1982 | Type | Earlier application | EP0100143 |