EP0132617 - A transfer apparatus for articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/07] | Orbital feeder | ||
[1986/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. A. JONES & CO. INC. 2701 Crescent Springs Road Covington Kentucky 41017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states R. A. JONES & CO. INC. 2701 Crescent Springs Road Covington Kentucky 41017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenwell, Joseph Daniel 224 Field View Circle Florence Kentucky 41042 / US | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84107451.1 | 22.06.1983 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | US19820395288 | 06.07.1982 Original published format: US 395288 | [1985/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132617 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132617 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B31B1/78, B65H3/08 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
B65H3/42 (EP,US);
B31B2100/00 (EP,US);
B31B2120/30 (EP,US);
B31B50/062 (EP,US);
B31B50/804 (EP,US);
B65H2403/543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/07] | Title | German: | Transporteinrichtung für Gegenstände | [1986/49] | English: | A transfer apparatus for articles | [1986/49] | French: | Appareil de transfert pour des objets | [1986/49] |
Former [1985/07] | Kreisbahnförderer | ||
Former [1985/07] | Orbital feeder | ||
Former [1985/07] | Transporteur orbiculaire | Examination procedure | 27.06.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 22.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP83303584.3 / EP0100143 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3386558 [ ] (VICTOR BENATAR); | DE2811159 [ ] (MARTELLI GUGLIELMO); | US4232591 [ ] (KARPINSKY WILLIAM J) |