EP0130606 - Collapsible ski [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bru Moya, Manuel Via Augusta 203 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states Escolies Bordoy, Juan Via Augusta 203 Barcelona / ES | [1985/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Kern, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte KERN, VOLPERT & KOLLEGEN Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107648.2 | 20.06.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | ES19830273128 | 23.06.1983 Original published format: ES 273128 | ES19840279918 | 11.06.1984 Original published format: ES 279918 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130606 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130606 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130606 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/02 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
A63C5/02 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32401 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Zusammenlegbarer Ski | [1985/02] | English: | Collapsible ski | [1985/02] | French: | Ski pliant | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 22.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.06.1990 | GB | 20.06.1990 | SE | 21.06.1990 | [1992/03] |
Former [1991/41] | GB | 20.06.1990 | |
SE | 21.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/12] | SE | 21.06.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE546897 (ENRICO SILVESTRI); | [A]CH171068 (JAUN HANS [CH]); | [A]DE1678273 (LANGE GEB KIRSPUU LINDA); | [A]EP0042449 (ESPER HERBERT) |