EP0131840 - Welding method for assembling a ferritic stainless steel pipe to a non alloyed carbon steel tube plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/04] | Assembly structure of a ferritic stainless steel pipe to a carbon steel tube plate, and method of making the same | ||
[1987/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1988 [1988/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEIN INDUSTRIE Société anonyme dite: 19-21, Avenue Morane Saulnier B.P. 74 F-78141 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states STEIN INDUSTRIE Société anonyme dite: 19-21, Avenue Morane Saulnier B.P. 74 F-78141 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franzolini, Marc 4, Allée les Fours Blancs Chevry II F-91191 Gif sur Yvette / FR | 02 /
Maria, Edmond 21, rue Albert 1er F-92600 Asnieres / FR | 03 /
Vanderschaeghe, Alain 20, rue Edgard Quinet F-59100 Roubaix / FR | 04 /
Bezier, Jean 319, rue Verte F-59170 Croix / FR | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107694.6 | 03.07.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | FR19830011262 | 06.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8311262 | [1985/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131840 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131840 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/00, B23K9/02, F16L41/08 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
B23K35/004 (EP,US);
B23K9/0288 (EP,US);
F16L41/084 (EP,US);
F28F21/082 (EP,US);
F28F21/083 (EP,US);
F28F9/0229 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Einschweissungsverfahren eines Rohrs aus ferritischem rostfreiem Stahl in eine Rohrplatte aus nicht legiertem Kohlenstoffstahl | [1987/46] | English: | Welding method for assembling a ferritic stainless steel pipe to a non alloyed carbon steel tube plate | [1987/46] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage par soudage d'un tube en acier inoxydable ferritique sur une plaque tubulaire en acier au carbone non allié | [1987/46] |
Former [1985/04] | Einschweissung eines Rohrs aus ferritischem rostfreiem Stahl in eine Rohrplatte aus Kohlenstoffstahl und Verfahren zur Herstellung | ||
Former [1985/04] | Assembly structure of a ferritic stainless steel pipe to a carbon steel tube plate, and method of making the same | ||
Former [1985/04] | Dispositif d'assemblage de tubes en acier inoxydable ferritique sur une plaque tubulaire en acier au carbone, et procédé de réalisation de ce dispositif | Examination procedure | 16.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/39] | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2785459 (CARPENTER OTIS R); | [A]US3257710 (BROWN FRANCIS X, et al); | [A]FR50024E (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO); | [A]FR840292 (DEUTSCHE ROHRENWERKE AG); | [A]FR2416793 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]) |