EP0131850 - Conductor for a submarine power cable, and method of manufacturing such a conductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LES CABLES DE LYON Société anonyme dite: 170 quai de Clichy F-92111 Clichy Cedex / FR | [1985/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thevenon, Henri 288, rue André Philip F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107811.6 | 05.07.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | FR19830011523 | 11.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8311523 | [1985/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0131850 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0131850 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131850 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/02, H01B13/26 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
H01B13/0214 (EP,US);
H01B13/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/04] | Title | German: | Leiter für Energieseekabel und Herstellungsverfahren von einem solchen Leiter | [1985/04] | English: | Conductor for a submarine power cable, and method of manufacturing such a conductor | [1985/04] | French: | Conducteur pour câble sous-marin d'énergie et procédé de fabrication d'un tel conducteur | [1985/04] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1170046 (GEOFFROY DELORE); | [A]FR1509988 (HACKETHAL DRAHT & KABELWERK AG, et al); | [A]FR2380370 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH [DE]) |