EP0131863 - Plastic casing cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Confederate Creek, Inc. 4500 - 15th St. East Tacoma, Washington 98424 / US | [1988/31] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states U.S.A.C. INC. 1476 Thorne Road Tacoma Washington 98421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vatsvog, Marlo Keith 10708 Country Club Lane South Seattle Washington 98168 / US | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107884.3 | 05.07.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | US19830514257 | 15.07.1983 Original published format: US 514257 | US19840569824 | 11.01.1984 Original published format: US 569824 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0131863 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0131863 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131863 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F42B5/30 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
F42B5/307 (EP);
F42B5/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Patronenhülse aus Kunststoff | [1985/04] | English: | Plastic casing cartridge | [1985/04] | French: | Douille de munition en matière plastique | [1985/04] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/03] | 15.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.10.1986 | M02   Fee paid on   12.11.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.09.1988 | FR | 28.09.1988 | IT | 28.09.1988 | SE | 28.09.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 28.09.1988 | |
IT | 28.09.1988 | ||
SE | 28.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/46] | AT | 28.09.1988 | |
SE | 28.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 28.09.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | US3026802 [ ] (BARNET FREDRICK R, et al); | GB1015516 [ ] (REMINGTON ARMS CO INC); | FR2141742 [ ] (BOFORS AB); | DE2705235 [ ] (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) | Examination | US3099958 |