EP0132662 - Load selector for tapped transformers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1987 [1987/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Katzwanger Strasse 150 D-8500 Nürnberg 40 / DE | [1987/02] |
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Deckerstrasse 1 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widmann, Werner Endersbacher Strasse 36 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Mehl, Ernst, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107912.2 | 06.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | DE19833326549 | 22.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3326549 | [1985/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132662 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132662 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01F29/04, H01H1/16, H01H1/56, H01H9/00 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
H01H9/0016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI [1985/07] | Title | German: | Lastwähler für Stufentransformatoren | [1985/07] | English: | Load selector for tapped transformers | [1985/07] | French: | Sélecteur de charge pour transformateurs à échelons | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/21] | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2219220 [ ]; | AT320802B [ ] (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK [DE]); | GB1492954 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | DE2914928 [ ] (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK); | EP0029467 [ ] (ACEC [BE]) |