EP0131929 - Safety helmet for motor cyclists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/04] | Safety helmet for motor cyclists or the like | ||
[1987/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1988 [1988/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Siegfried Wörthstrasse 33 D-8000 München / DE | 02 /
Seehaus, Wolfgang Karl-Valentinstrasse 27 D-8047 Karlsfeld / DE | 03 /
Hofer, Bernhard Konradinstrasse 20 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Dexheimer, Rolf Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 40 02 40 Petuelring 130 - AJ-21 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1985/04] | Application number, filing date | 84108236.5 | 12.07.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | DE19833325601 | 15.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3325601 | [1985/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0131929 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0131929 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131929 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/00 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
A42B3/0493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Schutzhelm für Motorradfahrer | [1987/19] | English: | Safety helmet for motor cyclists | [1987/19] | French: | Casque de protection pour motocyclistes | [1987/19] |
Former [1985/04] | Schutzhelm für Motorradfahrer oder dergleichen | ||
Former [1985/04] | Safety helmet for motor cyclists or the like | ||
Former [1985/04] | Casque de protection pour motocyclistes ou similaires | Examination procedure | 21.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/18] | 03.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB487643 (EMIL FURLER); | [A]DE664959 (ERICH DESTNER); | [A]US2899150 ; | [X]US3548410 (PARKER JERRY W); | [A]US3770483 (KOMINE S); | [X]US3927421 (SIMON ALAN A); | [A]DE7607301U ; | [X]FR2313879 (GYOERY KALMAN [DE]); | [X]US4075714 (RYDER JAMES H, et al); | [A]GB2048056 (INT HELMETS AG); | [A]US4354648 (SCHENK KARL M, et al); | [XP]EP0090720 (RENAULT [FR]); | [XP]DE8316411U |