EP0132722 - Method for producing tin-free steel strips having improved lacquer adhesion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-chome Kitahonmachi-dori Fukiai-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-chome Kitahonmachi-dori Fukiai-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogata, Hajime c/o Research Laboratories Kawasaki Steel Corp. 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Yamaji, Kyoko c/o Research Laboratories Kawasaki Steel Corp. 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 03 /
Tsugawa, Shunichi Research Laboratories Kawasaki Steel Corp. 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 04 /
Ichida, Toshio Research Laboratories Kawasaki Steel Corp. 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 05 /
Irie, Toshio Research Laboratories Kawasaki Steel Corp. 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108249.8 | 13.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | JP19830132071 | 20.07.1983 Original published format: JP 13207183 | [1985/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132722 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/38, C25D3/04, C25D11/26, C25D7/06 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
C25D11/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung zinnfreier Stahlbänder mit verbessertem Haftvermögen für Lacke | [1985/07] | English: | Method for producing tin-free steel strips having improved lacquer adhesion | [1985/07] | French: | Procédé pour la production de bandes en acier exemptes d'étain ayant une adhésion améliorée pour laques | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 03.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP57177998 [ ]; | JP5528309 [ ]; | JP5558395 [ ]; | US3986940 [ ]; | US3679554 [ ] | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 7, no. 22, January 28, 1983 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 55 C 148 & JP-A-57-177 998 (kawasaki seitetsu k.k.), & JP57177998 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 4, no. 61, May 8, 1980 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 50 c 9 & JP-A-55-28 309 (shin nippon seitetsu k.k.), & JP5528309 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unxamined applications, C field, vol. 4, no. 98, July 15, 1980 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 13 C 18 & JP-A-55-58 395 (kawasaki seitetsu k.k.), & JP5558395 A 00000000 |