EP0145835 - Timer circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartels, James I. 109 - 13th Street Hudson Wisconsin 54016 / US | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Herzbach, Dieter, et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 63008 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108396.7 | 17.07.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | US19830515408 | 20.07.1983 Original published format: US 515408 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0145835 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145835 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/284, F23N5/24 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
H03K17/284 (EP,US);
F23N5/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/26] | Title | German: | Zeitgeberschaltung | [1985/26] | English: | Timer circuit | [1985/26] | French: | Circuit d'horloge | [1985/26] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/21] | 15.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3633050 (ZAJAC CHESTER J); | [A]US3764832 (STETTNER J); | [A]DE2556751 (PREH ELEKTRO FEINMECHANIK) |