EP0168517 - Suspension spring compression device for the mounting and removal of shock absorbers in automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.1988 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klann, Horst Terra-Wohnpark 11 D-7730 Villingen-Schwenningen 24 / DE | [1986/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Neymeyer, Franz Haselweg 20 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Neymeyer, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Haselweg 20 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108538.4 | 19.07.1984 | [1986/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0168517 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0168517 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/30 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
B25B27/304 (EP);
B60G2206/921 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1987/28] |
Former [1986/04] | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung für Achsfedern zum Ein- und Ausbauen von Stossdämpfern bei Kraftwagen | [1986/04] | English: | Suspension spring compression device for the mounting and removal of shock absorbers in automotive vehicles | [1986/04] | French: | Dispositif de compression des ressorts de suspension pour la pose et la dépose des amortisseurs dans les véhicules automobiles | [1986/04] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 17.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2646618 ; | [A]FR2290276 ; | [A]US4061308 ; | [A]US3883116 |