EP0133269 - Locking mechanism for an office panel system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TANDEM GROUP INC. 6916 Aragon Circle Buena Park California90620 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/08] | For all designated states THE TANDEM GROUP INC. 6916 Aragon Circle Buena Park California90620 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bates, Norman H. 1182 Hyde Park Santa Ana California / US | [1985/08] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/08] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108692.9 | 23.07.1984 | [1985/08] | Priority number, date | US19830518692 | 29.07.1983 Original published format: US 518692 | [1985/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0133269 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0133269 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/74 | [1985/08] | CPC: |
E04B2/7425 (EP,US);
Y10S52/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/08] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsvorrichtung für ein Büro-Wandsystem | [1985/08] | English: | Locking mechanism for an office panel system | [1985/08] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour un système de cloison de bureau | [1985/08] | File destroyed: | 17.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/32] | 04.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3425171 (PROPST ROBERT L, et al); | [A]US3463201 (ROBINSON GORDON S, et al); | [A]US3766696 (TOTOONCHIE E); | [A]US3797184 (THOMPSON R); | [A]US3807112 (PERINA J); | [A]DE7429246U ; | [A]US3908320 (HOGUE NORMAN E); | [A]US4120124 (TEMPLE PHILIP A, et al); | [A]US4158936 (FULTON JAMES F [US]); | [A]DE3016613 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT [DE]) |