EP0135699 - FET read only memory cell with with word line augmented precharging of the bit line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kouba, Daniel J. 8935 Westchester Drive Manassas, VA 22111 / US | [1985/14] | Representative(s) | Louet Feisser, Arnold Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Louet Feisser, Arnold Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 NL-1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | ||
Former [1985/14] | Suringar, Willem Joachim Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 NL-1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | Application number, filing date | 84108711.7 | 24.07.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | US19830534035 | 20.09.1983 Original published format: US 534035 | [1985/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135699 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135699 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135699 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G11C17/00 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
G11C17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1985/14] | Title | German: | Festwertspeicher-FET-Zelle mit vergrösserter Bitleitungsvorladung durch eine Wortleitung | [1985/14] | English: | FET read only memory cell with with word line augmented precharging of the bit line | [1985/14] | French: | Cellule FET de mémoire morte avec mentation de précharge de ligne de bit par ligne de mot | [1985/14] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/14] | 23.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.1989 | [1990/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 16, no. 5, October 1973, page 1642, New York, US; H.O. ASKIN: "Single device push-pull read-only storage cell" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 8, January 1973, pages 2371,2372, New York, US; P.W. COOK et al.: "Read-only memory fabrication by laser formed connections" |