EP0133681 - Enzymatic urea assay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1989 [1989/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miles Italiana SpA Via FL Miles 10 I-20040 Cavenago Brianza (Mi) / IT | [1985/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fossati, Piero Via M. Buonarroti, 36 I-20035 Lissone Milano / IT | [1985/10] | Representative(s) | Adrian, Albert, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Adrian, Albert, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Lizenzen und Technische Kooperationen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1986/29] | Jesse, Ralf-Rüdiger, Dr. Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Lizenzen und technische Kooperationen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1985/10] | Senftl, Hannes, Dr. c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-5090 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108995.6 | 30.07.1984 | [1985/10] | Priority number, date | IT19830048827 | 09.08.1983 Original published format: IT 4882783 | [1985/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0133681 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0133681 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0133681 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/58 | [1985/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/10] | Title | German: | Enzymatische Bestimmung von Harnstoff | [1988/37] | English: | Enzymatic urea assay | [1985/10] | French: | Essai enzymatique d'urée | [1985/10] |
Former [1985/10] | Enzymatische Probe von Harnstoff | Examination procedure | 30.07.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 10.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4194063 (FRANK DAVID S [US], et al); | [A]FR2436182 (TOYO JOZO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0069488 (ICI PLC [GB]) | [A] - M. DIXON et al. "Enzymes", 3rd edition, 1979, LONGMAN GROUP LTD., London, UK, pages 906-907, 2nd example | Examination | - J. Biol. Chem. (1972) 247 4107-4113 |