EP0135733 - Epitaxial diode for a high reverse voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.11.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH Sigmundstrasse 200 D-8500 Nürnberg 82 / DE | ||
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states SEMIKRON, GESELLSCHAFT FÜR GLEICHRICHTERBAU UND ELEKTRONIK M.B.H. Sigmundstrasse 200 D-8500 Nürnberg 82 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chadda, Madan Mohan An der Breiting 7 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1985/14] | Application number, filing date | 84109176.2 | 02.08.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | DE19833328521 | 06.08.1983 Original published format: DE 3328521 | [1985/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135733 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135733 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/91, H01L29/36 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
H01L29/167 (EP);
H01L29/861 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/14] | Title | German: | Epitaxialdiode für hohe Sperrspannung | [1985/14] | English: | Epitaxial diode for a high reverse voltage | [1985/14] | French: | Diode épitaxiale pour haute tension de blocage | [1985/14] | File destroyed: | 17.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 08.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 13.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/52] | 27.07.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5645081 ; | [A]US4053924 ; | [A]DE2702451 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 103 (E-64)[775], 3. Juli 1981; & JP - A - 56 45 081 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 24.04.1981, & JP5645081 A 00000000 |