EP0135118 - Method of producing fine particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 5-2, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Riken 13-5, Kudan-Kita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | For all designated states THE FOUNDATION THE RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF ELECTRIC AND MAGNETIC ALLOYS 1-1, Yagiyama Minami 2-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi No. 8-22 Kamisugi 3-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 5-2, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA RIKEN 13-5, Kudan-Kita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | |||
For all designated states THE FOUNDATION THE RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF ELECTRIC AND MAGNETIC ALLOYS 1-1, Yagiyama Minami 2-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi No. 8-22 Kamisugi 3-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 5-2, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA RIKEN 13-5, Kudan-Kita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | |||
For all designated states Ohnuma, Shigehiro 4-126, Oidemae Moniwa-aza Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi No. 8-22 Kamisugi 3-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
Former [1985/13] | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 5-2, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakanouchi, Yukio 9-8, Honcho 3-chome Ageo-shi Saitama / JP | |||
For all designated states Ohnuma, Shigehiro 4-126, Oidemae Moniwa-aza Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi No. 8-22 Kamisugi 3-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakanouchi, Yukio 9-8, Honcho 3-chome Ageo-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ohnuma, Shigehiro 4-126, Oidemae, Moniwa-aza Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | 03 /
Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 8-22, Kamisugi 3-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | [1985/13] | Representative(s) | Sandmair, Kurt, et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 D-81629 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/13] | Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109457.6 | 08.08.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | JP19830144923 | 10.08.1983 Original published format: JP 14492383 | [1985/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135118 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135118 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135118 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34, H01F1/06 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
H01F41/18 (EP,US);
B22F9/008 (EP,US);
B22F9/14 (EP,US);
C23C14/0005 (EP,US);
C23C14/0036 (EP,US);
C23C14/022 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (EP,US);
G11B5/714 (EP,US);
H01F1/1535 (EP,US);
H01F1/15358 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1985/13] | C23C14/34, // H01F1/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von feinen Partikeln | [1985/13] | English: | Method of producing fine particles | [1985/13] | French: | Procédé de production de particules fines | [1985/13] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 07.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3303116 (MAISSELL LEON I, et al); | [A]DE2702283 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]EP0054269 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [A]US4396643 (KUEHN ROBERT D, et al) |