EP0141925 - Circuit for the suppression of retarding field oscillations in electronic tubes, especially for a pulse duration modulation stage of a transmitter system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stahl, Jochen, Ing. grad. Xantenerstrasse 15a D-1000 Berlin 15 / DE | 02 /
Beling, Ingo, Ing. grad. Baluschekweg 59 D-1000 Berlin 20 / DE | [1985/21] | Application number, filing date | 84109461.8 | 08.08.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | DE19833331267 | 30.08.1983 Original published format: DE 3331267 | [1985/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141925 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141925 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H03C1/16, H03K7/08 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
H03C1/16 (EP,US);
H03K7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1985/21] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Verhinderung von Bremsfeldschwingungen in Elektronenröhren, insbesondere für eine Pulsdauermodulationsstufe in Sendeanlagen | [1985/21] | English: | Circuit for the suppression of retarding field oscillations in electronic tubes, especially for a pulse duration modulation stage of a transmitter system | [1985/21] | French: | Montage pour supprimer les oscillations de champ retardateur dans des tubes électroniques, en particulier pour un étage de modulation de durée d'impulsion d'un arrangement émetteur | [1985/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 09.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE568768 (ERNST GERHARD DR); | [A]DE949831 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE966030 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US3179893 (BAUMAN RICHARD D); | [A]FR2386935 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) |