EP0137228 - Photopolymerizable composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwasaki, Masayuki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Minoru c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Shinozaki, Fumiaki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | [1985/16] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109695.1 | 14.08.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | JP19830149335 | 16.08.1983 Original published format: JP 14933583 | [1985/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0137228 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0137228 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137228 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/50, G03C1/68 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
C08F2/50 (EP,US);
G03F7/031 (EP,US);
Y10S430/12 (EP,US);
Y10S430/121 (EP,US);
Y10S430/122 (EP,US);
Y10S430/123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1985/16] | Title | German: | Photopolymerisierbare Zusammensetzung | [1985/16] | English: | Photopolymerizable composition | [1985/16] | French: | Composition photopolymérisable | [1985/16] | File destroyed: | 17.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 20.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 03.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3945833 (SUMITA MASUJIRO, et al); | [XP]DE3339228 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |