EP0135779 - Polycarbonate resin mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boutni, Omar Mohamed 1232 Oriole Circle Mt. Vernon Indiana 47620 / US | 02 /
Belfoure, Edward Louis R.R. 1, Box 37 New Harmony Indiana 47631 / US | [1985/14] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1988/02] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1985/14] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84109754.6 | 16.08.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | US19830527744 | 30.08.1983 Original published format: US 527744 | [1985/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135779 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135779 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135779 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0135779 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, // (C08L69/00, 67:02, 51:04) | [1985/14] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L69/005 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/005, C08L2666/24 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L67/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/14] | Title | German: | Polycarbonatharz-Zusammensetzungen | [1985/14] | English: | Polycarbonate resin mixtures | [1985/14] | French: | Compositions de résines de polycarbonate | [1985/14] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 12.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4226961 (MOTZ GARY STEPHEN [US]); | [X]EP0064648 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]US4391954 (SCOTT STEVEN W); | [A]EP0135904 (MOBAY CHEMICAL CORP [US]) |