blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0144535

EP0144535 - Method for the thermal treatment of wastes comprising further processing of the obtained residue [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.1991
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.01.1992 [1992/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Kommunal-Anlagen Miete GmbH
c/o Deutsche Anlagen-Leasing GmbH Wilhelm-Theodor-Römheld-Strasse 30
D-6500 Mainz / DE
[1987/27]
Former [1985/25]For all designated states
Deutsche Kommunal-Anlagen Miete GmbH
Candidplatz 9-11
D-8000 München 90 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hillekamp, Klaus, Dr.
Musäusstrasse 3
D-8000 München 60 / DE
02 / Berghoff, Rolf, Dr.
Lötterfelderstrasse 17
D-4005 Büderich / DE
[1985/25]
Representative(s)Tetzner, Volkmar
Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner
Van-Gogh-Strasse 3
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/36]Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur.
Van-Gogh-Strasse 3
D-81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date84109821.317.08.1984
[1985/25]
Priority number, dateDE1983333057717.08.1983         Original published format: DE 3330577
[1985/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0144535
Date:19.06.1985
Language:DE
[1985/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0144535
Date:16.07.1986
Language:DE
[1986/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0144535
Date:16.01.1991
Language:DE
[1991/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1986
ClassificationIPC:B03B9/04, B07B9/00, B03C7/00
[1985/25]
CPC:
B07B9/00 (EP); B03B9/04 (EP); B03B9/06 (EP);
B03C7/003 (EP); Y02W30/52 (EP); Y02W30/62 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1985/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur thermischen Behandlung von Abfällen unter Weiterverwertung des entstehenden Rückstandes[1985/25]
English:Method for the thermal treatment of wastes comprising further processing of the obtained residue[1985/25]
French:Procédé de traitement thermique des déchets avec exploitation du résidu obtenu[1985/25]
Examination procedure20.12.1986Examination requested  [1987/09]
11.08.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.07.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1990Fee for grant paid
04.10.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.10.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR876310  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG);
 [X]DE1751974  (VER KESSELWERKE AG);
 [Y]DE2939128  (HOELTER ING GRAD HEINZ [DE]);
 [A]EP0029580  (OFAG OFENBAU FEUERUNGSTECH AG [CH]);
 [X]DE2950324  (BERGHOFF ROLF DIPL ING);
 [X]EP0067901  (DEUTSCHE KOMMUNAL ANLAGEN [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.