EP0135162 - Tartric acid monoesters of optically active aminoalcohols, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindner, Wolfgang, Prof. Dr. St. Veiter-Anger 22 A-8046 Graz / AT | [1985/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/13] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/13] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109849.4 | 17.08.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | DE19833330005 | 19.08.1983 Original published format: DE 3330005 | [1985/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135162 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135162 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135162 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C219/02 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07C275/38 (EP,US);
C07D209/88 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/13] | C07C93/187 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/13] | Title | German: | Weinsäuremonoester von optisch aktiven Alkanolaminen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1985/13] | English: | Tartric acid monoesters of optically active aminoalcohols, process for their preparation and their use | [1985/13] | French: | Monoesters d'acide tartrique et d'aminoalcools optiquement actifs, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1985/13] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/46] | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, Band 65, Nr. 1, 1982, Seiten 377-384, Schweizerische Chemische Gesellschaft, CH; V. PRELOG et al.: "Über die Enanatiomerentrennung durch Verteilung zwischen flüssigen Phasen" | [A] - AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, Band 32, Nr. 1, Januar 1979, Seiten 65-70, AU; K.H. BELL: "Kinetic resolution in the reaction of (2R,3R)-2,3-diacetoxy- and (2R,3R)-2,3-dibenzoyloxy-succinic anhydrides with racemic alcohols" |