EP0166805 - Heat transfer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1989 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumberger, Peter Reitweg 3 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1986/02] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109863.5 | 18.08.1984 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | CH19840003253 | 05.07.1984 Original published format: CH 325384 | [1986/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0166805 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0166805 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166805 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/18, F22B21/22, F28D7/00 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
F22B21/22 (EP,US);
F22B1/1838 (EP,US);
F22B35/007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/02] | F22B1/18, F28D7/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/10] |
Former [1986/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Wärmeübertragersystem | [1986/02] | English: | Heat transfer system | [1986/02] | French: | Système de transfert de chaleur | [1986/02] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1985 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, LU, SE | 22.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 24.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.07.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 05.07.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1990/27] | BE | 31.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0111615 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]GB1195154 (WAAGNER BIRO AG [AT]); | [A]CH174774 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]FR2513146 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]) |