EP0134039 - Edge-protecting border [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halm, Peter Schillerstrasse 10 72293 Glatten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | For all designated states Halm, Peter Schillerstrasse 10 D-7296 Glatten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/11] | Representative(s) | Lutz, Johannes Dieter Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | Lutz, Johannes Dieter, Dr. Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | ||
Former [1986/28] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1986/02] | Ott, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kappelstrasse 8 D-72160 Horb 1 / DE | ||
Former [1985/11] | Lutz, Johannes Dieter, Dr. Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 D-70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109913.8 | 20.08.1984 | [1985/11] | Priority number, date | DE19833329963 | 19.08.1983 Original published format: DE 3329963 | DE19833338278 | 21.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3338278 | [1985/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134039 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134039 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134039 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/06, E04F13/04 | [1985/11] | CPC: |
E04F13/04 (EP);
E04F13/06 (EP);
E04F13/068 (EP);
E04F2013/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/11] | Title | German: | Kantenschutz-Richtwinkel | [1985/11] | English: | Edge-protecting border | [1985/11] | French: | Bordure protectrice des arêtes | [1985/11] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 11.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.1986 | 31.08.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 18.05.1988 | SE | 31.05.1988 | [1989/23] |
Former [1989/11] | NL | 18.05.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2641585 ; | [A]FR1502610 ; | [A]US2196086 ; | [AD]DE8222937U ; | [A]DE3238312 ; | [A]US2590846 ; | [A]US2904856 ; | [A]US2643423 ; | [A]GB1225790 ; | [A]US3109207 |