EP0141937 - Device for storing substantially disc-shaped record carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1990 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states idn inventions and development of novelties ag Hartbertstrasse 9 CH-7002 Chur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states idn inventions and development of novelties ag Hartbertstrasse 9 CH-7002 Chur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ackeret, Peter Allmendstrasse 18 CH-8700 Küsnacht / CH | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1985/21] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110035.7 | 23.08.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | EP19830108481 | 29.08.1983 Original published format: EP 83108481 | DE19840023125U | 03.08.1984 Original published format: DE 8423125 U | [1985/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141937 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141937 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/03 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
G11B23/023 (EP,US);
G11B23/02 (EP,KR,US);
G11B23/03 (KR);
G11B33/0416 (EP,US);
G11B33/0444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/27] |
Former [1985/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Behälter zum Aufbewahren von im wesentlichen plattenförmigen Aufzeichnungsträgern | [1985/21] | English: | Device for storing substantially disc-shaped record carriers | [1985/21] | French: | Appareil pour le rangement de supports d'informations essentiellement en forme de disque | [1985/21] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LU, NL | 02.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 06.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.09.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 24.09.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 24.09.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 24.09.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 24.09.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.03.1989 | IT | 22.03.1989 | SE | 22.03.1989 | [2007/44] |
Former [2002/24] | FR | 22.03.1989 | |
IT | 22.03.1989 | ||
SE | 22.03.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.03.1989 | |
SE | 22.03.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 22.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2307410 (FUEWESI PETER); | [A]US2539647 (WILLIAMS PAUL E); | [A]FR1113766 ; | [A]DE1131026 (AMANN PETER MARIO); | [A]US3275158 (RONALD GLASS, et al) |