EP0142637 - Disc cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1985/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yoshitake Hitachi Maxell, Ltd. Shihoryo 1468-5, Furumagi Ishigemachi Yuki-gun Ibaraki / JP | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1985/22] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110037.3 | 23.08.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | JP19830155232 | 24.08.1983 Original published format: JP 15523283 | [1985/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142637 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142637 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/00, G11B23/033 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
G11B23/0332 (EP,US);
G11B23/03 (KR);
G11B23/0035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/22] | Title | German: | Plattenkassette | [1985/22] | English: | Disc cartridge | [1985/22] | French: | Cassette de disque | [1985/22] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 18.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0085983 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [Y]FR2291243 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]US4149207 (PORTER JR TOWNSEND H, et al); | [A]FR2508220 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4216511 (BILEK FRANK T [US]); | [AP]EP0094773 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | [A] - PLASTIQUES MODERNES ET ELASTOMERES, vol. 25, no. 5, June 1973, pages 141-147, Paris, FR; P.G. LINSEN et al.: "Fibres minérales pour le renforcement des plastiques" |