EP0135834 - Preparation process for polypropylen molding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dorrer, Bernhard, Dr. Seebachstrasse 24 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | 02 /
Strametz, Helmut, Dr. Unterlindau 72 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1985/14] | Application number, filing date | 84110252.8 | 29.08.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | DE19833331877 | 03.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3331877 | [1985/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135834 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135834 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/08 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08F297/083 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L2308/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/12, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Polypropylen-Formmasse | [1985/14] | English: | Preparation process for polypropylen molding | [1985/14] | French: | Procédé de préparation de masse à mouler à partir de polypropylène | [1985/14] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 23.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 26.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4339557 (HASUO MASAYOSHI, et al); | [X]EP0067525 (UNIROYAL INC [US]); | [AD]DE3140664 (EL PASO POLYOLEFINS [US]); | [AD]DE3208010 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]EP0037291 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) |