EP0134573 - Precision probe positioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.1989 [1989/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hendriks, Ferdinand 814 Buchwood Court San Jose California 95120 / US | 02 /
Taylor, Russell Highsmith 21 Adams Road Ossining New York 10562 / US | [1985/12] | Representative(s) | Ekström, Gösta IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 163 92 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | Ekström, Gösta E. IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1985/12] | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84110270.0 | 29.08.1984 | [1985/12] | Priority number, date | US19830530927 | 12.09.1983 Original published format: US 530927 | [1985/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134573 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134573 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134573 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/68, B25J13/08, G05D3/20 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
G01R1/06705 (EP,US);
B25J19/021 (EP,US);
B25J9/1015 (EP,US);
B25J9/14 (EP,US);
G05D3/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/15] | H01L21/68, B25J13/08, G05D3/20 | ||
Former IPC [1985/12] | G05D3/20, B25J13/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/12] | Title | German: | Sonden-Präzisionspositionierer | [1985/12] | English: | Precision probe positioner | [1985/12] | French: | Positionneur de précision pour une sonde | [1985/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/12] | 19.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3007097 (SHELLEY EDWIN F, et al); | [A]DE2620600 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]DE1925152 (JIRA THOMAS J); | [A]US3405361 (KATTNER LIONEL E, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 12, no. 6, November 1969, page 868, New York, US; L. LACZKO et al.: "Electro-optical probe" |