EP0141141 - Adjustable bending roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/20] | Adjustable bendng roll | ||
[1992/50] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer-Escher Wyss AG Hardstrasse 319 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states SULZER-ESCHER WYSS AG Hardstrasse 319 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnyder, Eugen Rigiblick 521 CH-8913 Ottenbach / CH | 02 /
Güttinger, Heinz Langhansergasse 19 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Paschedag, Hansjoachim, et al c/o Sulzer - Escher Wyss AG Patentabteilung Postfach 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Paschedag, Hansjoachim, et al c/o Sulzer - Escher Wyss AG Patentabteilung Postfach CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 84110439.1 | 03.09.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | CH19830005244 | 28.09.1983 Original published format: CH 524483 | [1985/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141141 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141141 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141141 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0141141 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/14, F16C13/00 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
B21B27/055 (EP,US);
F16C13/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Durchbiegungseinstellwalze | [1985/20] | English: | Adjustable bending roll | [1992/50] | French: | Cylindre de cintrage ajustable | [1985/20] |
Former [1985/20] | Adjustable bendng roll | Examination procedure | 03.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/20] | 24.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.1987
19.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE Kleinewefers GmbH Kleinewefersstrasse 25 D-47803 Krefeld / DE Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Ulrich Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.1987
19.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE Kleinewefers GmbH Kleinewefersstrasse 25 D-47803 Krefeld / DE Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Kühhornshofweg 10 D-60320 Frankfurt / DE | 20.01.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.05.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.06.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.08.1992 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.08.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.10.1992 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.12.1989 | Appeal received No. T0015/90 | 30.03.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.08.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 04.08.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1987 | BE | 30.09.1989 | NL | 01.04.1990 | FR | 31.05.1990 | SE | 04.09.1992 | [2003/31] |
Former [1999/52] | LU | 30.09.1987 | |
BE | 30.09.1989 | ||
NL | 01.04.1990 | ||
FR | 31.05.1990 | ||
Former [1991/35] | BE | 30.09.1989 | |
NL | 01.04.1990 | ||
FR | 31.05.1990 | ||
Former [1991/15] | BE | 30.09.1989 | |
NL | 01.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/43] | NL | 01.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1155750 (KARL MARX STADT MASCHF); | [A]DE1193792 (TEXTILMASCHINEN EDUARD KUESTER) | by applicant | DE1155750 | US3802044 | US3885283 | US3921514 | US4058877 | Opposition | DE1155750 | US3802044 | US3885283 | US3921514 | US4058877 |