blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0135857

EP0135857 - Rigid axle suspension for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.1988
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.11.1988 [1988/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/14]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Patentabteilung AJ-3
D-80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Matschinsky, Wolfgang
Korbinianplatz 9
D-8000 München 40 / DE
[1985/14]
Representative(s)Dexheimer, Rolf
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 40 02 40 Petuelring 130 - AJ-21
D-8000 München 40 / DE
[1985/14]
Application number, filing date84110483.904.09.1984
[1985/14]
Priority number, dateDE1983333370617.09.1983         Original published format: DE 3333706
[1985/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0135857
Date:03.04.1985
Language:DE
[1985/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0135857
Date:03.07.1985
Language:DE
[1985/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0135857
Date:02.12.1987
Language:DE
[1987/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.1985
ClassificationIPC:B60G9/00
[1985/14]
CPC:
B60G9/00 (EP,US); B60G2200/314 (EP,US); B60G2200/341 (EP,US);
B60G2200/342 (EP,US); Y10S180/905 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1985/14]
TitleGerman:Aufhängung einer Starrachse für Fahrzeuge[1985/14]
English:Rigid axle suspension for vehicles[1985/28]
French:Suspension d'essieu rigide pour véhicules[1985/28]
Examination procedure11.05.1985Examination requested  [1985/30]
03.06.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.03.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.1987Fee for grant paid
05.06.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.09.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchGB166534  [ ];
 FR705786  [ ];
 FR810570  [ ] (MICHELIN & CIE);
 GB644131  [ ] (LEYLANDS MOTORS LTD, et al);
 FR1396781  [ ] (DAIMLER BENZ AKTIENGEELLSCHAFT);
 FR2026837  [ ] (FORD FRANCE);
 DE2263374  [ ] (OPEL ADAM AG);
 FR2225301  [ ] (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]);
 GB1373957  [ ] (ROVER CO LTD);
 GB1588275  [ ] (PATHFINDER EQUIPMENT CO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.