EP0136579 - Circuit with at last one microprocessor having presettable system parameters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.07.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herkert, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Kurzweg 3 D-8021 Schäftlarn / DE | 02 /
Stenzel, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Amselstrasse 5 D-8311 Vilsheim / DE | [1985/15] | Application number, filing date | 84110522.4 | 04.09.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | DE19833332304 | 07.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3332304 | [1985/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0136579 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/10 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
G05B19/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/15] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung mit wenigstens einem auf vorgegebene Betriebswerte einstellbaren Mikrocomputer | [1985/15] | English: | Circuit with at last one microprocessor having presettable system parameters | [1985/15] | French: | Circuit comportant au moins un micro-processeur ayant des paramètres de fonctionnement préréglables | [1985/15] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 24.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1988/35] | 09.04.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5794803 ; | [X]FR2357904 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 179, 14. September 1982, Seite 102P142; & JP - A - 57 94803 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 12-06-1982, & JP5794803 A 00000000 |