EP0136584 - Rotor for rotary machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikegami, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Himeji Works No. 840, Chiyoda-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Mori, Masakazu c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Himeji Works No. 840, Chiyoda-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo / JP | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110562.0 | 05.09.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | JP19830138993 | 05.09.1983 Original published format: JP 13899383 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0136584 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136584 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02K13/00, H02K9/00 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
H02K13/02 (EP,US);
H02K9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/15] | Title | German: | Rotor für drehende Maschine | [1985/15] | English: | Rotor for rotary machine | [1985/15] | French: | Rotor pour machine tournante | [1985/15] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 04.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.1988
16.12.1988
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.1988
16.12.1988
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | 20.12.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.04.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.04.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 24.05.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.05.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/32] | 07.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 18.06.1990 | Appeal received No. T0486/90 | 18.06.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.05.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 07.05.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.1991 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0030725 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [Y]DE3025735 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |