EP0136588 - Radiation image recording and reproducing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosoi, Yuichi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co. Ltd No. 798, Hiyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kenji c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 798, Hiyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa / JP | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110577.8 | 05.09.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | JP19830163877 | 06.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16387783 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136588 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136588 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136588 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
G01T1/2016 (EP,US);
G01T1/2012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/15] | Title | German: | Strahlungsbildaufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabesystem | [1985/24] | English: | Radiation image recording and reproducing method | [1985/15] | French: | Dispositif pour l'enregistrement et reproduction d'image de rayonnement | [1985/24] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/35] | 15.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1992
10.03.1992
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1992
10.03.1992
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1992
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 24.03.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.10.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.10.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.04.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.07.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/03] | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 04.07.1994 | Appeal received No. T0563/94 | 05.09.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.07.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.07.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 22.06.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0077678 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0079791 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - M.J. WEBER: "CRC Handbook of Laser Science and Technology", vol. 1, "Lasers and Masers", 1982, pages 179-213, section 2.2 "Semiconductors used for lasers", CRC PRESS, Inc., Boca Raton, US; |